Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
State Farm General Insurance Company, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Coloma, Pres M, Coloma, Hildegard, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts Lodi Branch with Holland, Lesley D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHolland, Lesley D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2010 |
CategoryConversion |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions122 days |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseLodi Branch |
Case Cycle Time3429 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case status updated to Closed.
Judge: Holland, Lesley D. |
|
November 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
location changed from Courthouse to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Other
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
May 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed by State Farm General Insurance Company on 05/12/2010.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
May 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Association created between Wall, Robert E. and State Farm General Insurance Company.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
May 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Milestone of Disposition 24 months met timely.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
May 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Milestone of Disposition 12 months met timely.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
May 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Milestone of Disposition 18 months met timely.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
May 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Status of Pres Coloma updated to Dismissed without Prejudice.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
May 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.
Judge: CONVERSION |
|
May 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Association created between Wall, Robert E. and State Farm General Insurance Company.
Judge: CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.