Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
American Express Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Michael Lina M, against Moncarz Erik Aka Erik S. Moncarz, Outlaws Cafe Inc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys Courthouse East with Rupert A. Byrdsong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRupert A. Byrdsong Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management147 days |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2017 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions73 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys Courthouse East |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Court - Before Trial |
Case Cycle Time331 days |
Document:Proof of Service-Summons & Com Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Document:Report Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Document:Application Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Document:Summons Issued Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: American Express Bank, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service-Summons & Com Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Document:Request-Dismissal-Partial Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Document:Request-Enter Judgment Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Document:Request-Enter Default Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Complaint Filed by American Express Bank, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Summons Filed by American Express Bank, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Report Filed by American Express Bank, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by American Express Bank, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Notice Filed by American Express Bank, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Order Filed by American Express Bank, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Declaration Filed by American Express Bank, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by American Express Bank, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by American Express Bank, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-13 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Request-Dismissal-Partial Filed by American Express Bank, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Default Entered Filed by American Express Bank, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint Filed by American Express Bank, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Ventura)) Filed by American Express Bank, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint Filed by American Express Bank, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Sacramento)) Filed by American Express Bank, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Ventura)) Filed by American Express Bank, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Declaration Filed by American Express Bank, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Application Filed by American Express Bank, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Request-Enter Judgment Filed by American Express Bank, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Declaration Filed by American Express Bank, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-13 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by American Express Bank, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Declaration Filed by American Express Bank, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Default Entered Filed by American Express Bank, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by American Express Bank, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by American Express Bank, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Declaration (Re Use of Copies in Lieu of Original Documents) Filed by American Express Bank, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-15 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by American Express Bank, (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Application
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Report
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-15 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Declaration (of Brian P. McGurk in Compliance w/CRC 1.20(b)(2)(A),(B))
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Order (for Judgment and Court's Acceptance of Copies in Lieu of Originals)
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Sacramento))
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Ventura))
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Request-Dismissal-Partial
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Request-Enter Judgment
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Declaration (Re Use of Copies in Lieu of Original Documents)
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Ventura))
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.