Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Jun Eric J, against Agaronyan Liana, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys Courthouse East with Rupert A. Byrdsong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRupert A. Byrdsong Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management140 days |
Filing DateJuly 24, 2017 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions182 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys Courthouse East |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Court - Before Trial |
Case Cycle Time310 days |
Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Document:Request-Enter Judgment Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2017-07-28T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Document:Summons Issued Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Document:Request-Dismissal-Partial Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service-Summons & Com Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00Document:Notice-Continuance Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Document:Request-Dismissal-Partial Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Document:Request-Enter Judgment Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Document:Notice-Continuance Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Document:Summary Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Document:Request-Enter Default Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-09 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Discover Bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Discover Bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Request-Dismissal-Partial Filed by Discover Bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Request-Enter Judgment Filed by Discover Bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint Filed by Discover Bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Discover Bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by Discover Bank (Plaintiff)
Date: April 29, 2022Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Summary Filed by Discover Bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Order Filed by Discover Bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Discover Bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Discover Bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Writ - Return Filed by Clerk
Date: November 15, 2022Request-Dismissal-Partial Filed by Discover Bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-09 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Summons Filed by null
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Discover Bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Request-Enter Judgment Filed by Discover Bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Discover Bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-11 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Discover Bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Default Entered Filed by Discover Bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Discover Bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-07-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-09 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Discover Bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-30 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Default Judgment Filed by Discover Bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Discover Bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: May 03, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-09 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-11 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-07-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles))
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Request-Enter Judgment
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-09 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Request-Dismissal-Partial
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Request-Enter Judgment
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Request-Dismissal-Partial
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-09 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Default Judgment
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Summary
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-30 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.