Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tarzana Investment Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Abrams Alan K., against Does 1-20, Empty Bottles Lllp, Tran Christine, Peasant, represented by Salomons Gary K, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Frank J. Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrank J. Johnson Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 27, 2017 |
CategoryUd/Commercial (Not Drugs/Evict) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time87 days |
Notice-Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Proof of Service-Summons & Com
Date: 2017-04-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint
Date: 2017-04-03T00:00:00Summons Issued
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Request-Trial Setting
Date: May 08, 2017Answer
Date: April 28, 2017Answer (EMPTY BOTTLES, LLP; AND CHRISTINE TRAN )
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Request-Trial Setting
Date: May 08, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.