Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
American Express Bank Fsb, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Michael Lina N., Slinsky Lourdes R, against Arakyan Armen, Avagyan Armen Aka Armen Arakyan, Sapphire Advanced Services Inc., Se Sapphire Advanced, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys Courthouse East with John J. Kralik presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn J. Kralik Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management140 days |
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions394 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys Courthouse East |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Court - Before Trial |
Case Cycle Time492 days |
Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Document:Report Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2017-03-10T00:00:00Document:Notice-Order to Show Cause Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Document:Request-Dismissal-Partial Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Document:Summons Issued Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Document:Notice-Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-08-16T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2017-07-03T00:00:00Document:Report Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Document:Request-Dismissal-Partial Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: November 30, 2022Document:Proof of Publication Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Document:Application-Pub of Summons Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Document:Request-Enter Judgment Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Document:Order-Publication Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-18 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Request-Dismissal-Partial Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Writ - Return Filed by Sheriff's Dept.
Date: April 30, 2020Proof of Publication Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Default Entered Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Declaration Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-08-16T00:00:00Application-Pub of Summons Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles)) Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Summons Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Declaration Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Notice-Order to Show Cause Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Complaint Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Declaration Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-18 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Request-Enter Judgment Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-11 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Report Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-07-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-10 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Report Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-03-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-10 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Ventura)) Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Order for Publication Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-18 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-07-18T00:00:00Declaration Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Request-Dismissal-Partial Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Notice Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)
Date: November 30, 2022Notice
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-07-03T00:00:00Report
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-10 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Application-Pub of Summons
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-18 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-18T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-18 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-11 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Request-Dismissal-Partial
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Report
Date: 2017-03-10T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Default Judgment
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Notice-Order to Show Cause
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2017-08-16T00:00:00Request-Dismissal-Partial
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Order for Publication
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-18 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Request-Enter Judgment
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Writ - Return
Date: April 30, 2020Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles))
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-10 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Ventura))
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.