Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
O'Neill Mary L. As Trustee Of The, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by O'Neill Mary Louise, against Does 1-50, Badal Elvis, All Others In Possession And All Persons, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Frank J. Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrank J. Johnson Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 06, 2017 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time129 days |
Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint
Date: March 02, 2017Summons
Date: February 06, 2017Complaint
Date: February 06, 2017Complaint
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00(Request-Dismissal)
Date: June 15, 2017Notice-Pending Action
Date: April 17, 2017Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Notice-Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Notice-Pending Action
Date: April 17, 2017Summons Issued
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Proof of Service-Summons & Com
Date: March 02, 2017Request-Dismissal (WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION )
Date: June 15, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.