Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The Bank Of New York Mellon, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Reider Patrick, against Ahmadi Mahmood, Matinahmadi Mahnaz, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys Courthouse East with Russell Steven Kussman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRussell Steven Kussman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management140 days |
Filing DateMarch 09, 2015 |
CategoryQuiet Title (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions137 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
|
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys Courthouse East |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Court - Before Trial |
Case Cycle Time274 days |
Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2015-10-06T00:00:00Document:Request-Enter Default Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2015-05-14T00:00:00Document:Summons-Issued Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2015-03-09T00:00:00Document:Notice-Continuance Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2015-08-27T00:00:00Document:Notice-Lis Pendens Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2015-03-12T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service-By Mailing Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2015-04-07T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2015-03-09T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2015-07-10T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service-Summons & Com Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2015-04-07T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2015-10-05T00:00:00Document:Request-Enter Default Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2015-07-08T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: N/A
Date: 2015-03-09T00:00:00Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: December 08, 2015Document:Notice-Continuance Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2015-10-06T00:00:00Document:Request-Enter Default Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2015-06-26T00:00:00Document:Notice-Order to Show Cause Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: November 13, 2015Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2015-10-05T00:00:00Document:Declaration of Diligence Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2015-04-07T00:00:00Document:Notice-Continuance Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2015-08-04T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: 2015-04-07T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint
Date: 2015-04-07T00:00:00Proof of Service-By Mailing
Date: 2015-04-07T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2015-05-14T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2015-06-26T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2015-08-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2015-10-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-07-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2015-08-27T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2015-07-08T00:00:00Notice-Order to Show Cause
Date: November 13, 2015Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-03-09T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2015-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: 2015-03-12T00:00:00Default Judgment
Date: December 08, 2015Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2015-10-05T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2015-10-05T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2015-10-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.