Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
American Express Bank Fsb, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Michael Lina N., against Maggay Santiago, Mercado Santiaga D, Mercado Santiago D, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Van Nuys Courthouse East with Russell Steven Kussman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRussell Steven Kussman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management140 days |
Filing DateOctober 10, 2013 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions200 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseVan Nuys Courthouse East |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Court - Before Trial |
Case Cycle Time249 days |
Summons-Issued
Date: 2013-10-10T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2014-05-12T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2014-04-18T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint
Date: 2014-03-13T00:00:00Stipulation & Order
Date: June 16, 2014Declaration
Date: 2013-12-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2014-03-14T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2013-10-10T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2014-02-25T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2014-01-07T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2013-10-25T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2014-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2013-10-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2014-02-25T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2014-03-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2014-04-18T00:00:00Request-Enter Judgment
Date: 2014-05-12T00:00:00Supplement
Date: October 31, 2014Writ of Execution
Date: August 21, 2014Request-Dismissal-Partial
Date: 2014-05-12T00:00:00Supplement
Date: December 02, 2015Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: August 21, 2014Writ of Execution
Date: March 03, 2015Supplement
Date: March 28, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.