Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ortega-Riek Sandro Javier Aka Sabrina Bas Ortega, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Pomona Courthouse South with Robert A. Dukes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert A. Dukes Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 05, 2018 |
CategoryPetition For Change Of Name (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
|
Filing Court HousePomona Courthouse South |
Case Outcome TypeCourt Finding - (Granted) |
Case Cycle Time61 days |
This complaint is a petition for change of name, recognition of change of gender, and issuance of a new birth certificate. The petitioner is requesting that the court decree a name change to conform to their gender identity. They also request a decre...
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case -
Date: October 05, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 05, 2018Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) -
Date: October 10, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change;)
Date: November 28, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change;)
Date: December 05, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding Non-Appearance Case Review (in chambers) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Judge: Peter A. Hernandez |
|
December 05, 2018 | Decree Changing Name and Order Recognizing Change of Gender and for Issuance of New Birth Certifica - Decree Changing Name and Order Recognizing Change of Gender and for Issuance of New Birth Certific | ||
December 05, 2018 | Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change;) | ||
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change - Held - Motion Granted Judge: Peter A. Hernandez |
|
December 05, 2018 | Hearing |
Decree Changing Name and Order Recognizing Change of Gender and for Issuance of New Birth Certificate Filed by Clerk |
|
December 05, 2018 | Hearing |
Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change;)) Filed by Clerk |
|
November 28, 2018 | Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change;) | ||
November 28, 2018 | Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change;) of 11/28/2018 | ||
November 28, 2018 | Hearing |
Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change;)) Filed by Clerk |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding Non-Appearance Case Review (in chambers) - Held - Continued Judge: Peter A. Hernandez |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.