We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Maria L. Almaraz Vs Jorge Almaraz

Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago

Almaraz Maria L., Bear Valley Shopping Center 26 Llc A Limited Liability California Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Barclay Thomas Y., against Almaraz Jorge, Almaraz Marina Aka Victoria Marina Almaraz Aka Victoria Marina Carceda Aka Marina Garcia Carceda An Individual, Bear Valley Shopping Center 26 Llc A Limited Liability California Corporation, represented by Hernandez Jesse Stuart Esq., Leech Daryl Wayne, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Pomona Courthouse Southwith Sarah J. Heidel presiding.

Case Details

Filing Date

July 10, 2018

Last Refreshed

March 31, 2022

Filing Location

Los Angeles County, CA

Filing Court House

Pomona Courthouse South

Judge

Sarah J. Heidel Track Judge’s New Cases

Category

Other Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction)

Practice Area

Commercial

Matter Type

Breach of Contract

Matter Type

Unknown Disposition

Verdict

Unclassified

Parties

Case Documents

Answer

Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00

Cross-Complaint

Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00

Answer

Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00

Answer

Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00

Answer

Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00

Answer

Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00

Proof of Personal Service

Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00

Notice

Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00

Complaint

Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00

Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl

Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00

Separate Statement

Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00

Notice of Related Case

Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00

Case Management Statement

Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00

Case Management Statement

Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00

Case Management Statement

Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00

Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles ))

Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00

Request for Judicial Notice

Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00

Separate Statement

Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00

Motion for Summary Adjudication

Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00

Request for Dismissal

Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00

Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles ))

Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00

Answer

Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00

Notice

Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00

Summons Issued

Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00

Proof-Service/Summons

Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00

Case Events

Type Description
Hearing Department B at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766
Case Management Conference
Docket Event Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Filed by Clerk
Hearing in Department B, Gregory J. Weingart, Presiding
Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

Judge: Gregory J. Weingart

Docket Event Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Filed by Clerk
Hearing in Department D, Lisa R. Washington, Presiding
Conference (Informal Settlement) - Held

Judge: Lisa R. Washington

Docket Event Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Filed by Clerk
Docket Event Minute Order ( (Conference Informal Settlement))
Filed by Clerk
Hearing in Department B, Gregory J. Weingart, Presiding
Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

Judge: Gregory J. Weingart

Docket Event Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Filed by Clerk
Docket Event Minute Order ( (Conference Informal Settlement))
Filed by Clerk
See all events