Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
American Express Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Michael Lina M. Esq., against Chen Jiazhi, Chen Jia Zhi, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Pomona Courthouse South with Robert A. Dukes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert A. Dukes Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management146 days |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions74 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HousePomona Courthouse South |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Court - Before Trial |
Case Cycle Time185 days |
Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Document:Dismissal of Does Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Document:Writ-Other Filed by: Judgment Creditor
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Court7COURT
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Document:Writ issued Filed by: Judgment Creditor
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-19T00:00:00Document:Abstract of Judgment Filed by: Judgment Creditor
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Document:Request for Court Judgment-Default Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Document:Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Declaration -
Date: July 17, 2018Declaration -
Date: July 23, 2018Judgment -
Date: July 23, 2018Order -
Date: July 23, 2018Request for Dismissal -
Date: July 23, 2018Request for Entry of Default / Judgment -
Date: July 23, 2018Tentative Ruling -
Date: July 23, 2018Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims -
Date: August 28, 2018Writ of Execution -
Date: August 28, 2018Writ of Execution -
Date: September 10, 2018Writ - Return
Date: November 19, 2018Writ - Return
Date: February 27, 2019Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: March 19, 2020Writ of Execution
Date: June 22, 2021Writ - Return
Date: January 07, 2022Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Declaration Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Writ issued Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Default Entered Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Request for Court Judgment-Default Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-19T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Writ-Other Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Complaint Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-23 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Judgment Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Dismissal of Does Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Court
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Order Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-14 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Declaration Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Writ of Execution Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Request for Court Judgment-Default
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-23 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Dismissal of Does
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-14 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Writ-Other
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: 2020-03-19T00:00:00Writ issued
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.