Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Enstad, Christel, Enstad, Roy Kurt, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Wiens, Colleen, Wiens, "Rex" Byron F, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategorySmall Claims - 5,001 To 10,000 |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2018 | Hearing |
Notice of Destruction of Subpoenaed Records Not Admitted Records for Hearing of: 01/29/2008 |
|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Destruction of Subpoenaed Records Not Admitted Records for Hearing of: 01/29/2008 |
|
August 30, 2013 | Hearing |
Exhibit(s) List Document Image |
|
August 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Exhibit(s) List Document Image |
|
June 18, 2013 | Hearing |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents Document Image |
|
March 17, 2008 | Hearing |
134A Pmt: Photocopy GC 70627(A) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $9.50 for ENSTAD, ROY KURT (PL-1). Received from ROY K ENSTAD, check no(s) 1034. Receipt #376095 for amount of $9.50. |
|
March 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
134A Pmt: Photocopy GC 70627(A) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $9.50 for ENSTAD, ROY KURT (PL-1). Received from ROY K ENSTAD, check no(s) 1034. Receipt #376095 for amount of $9.50. |
|
January 29, 2008 | Hearing |
NP1815 Department: AK Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: HEARING SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ROY KURT ENSTAD (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. CHRISTEL ENSTAD (PL-2) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. "REX" BYRON F WIENS (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. DEFENDANT IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. COLLEEN WIENS (DE-2) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. LARRY WIGENT DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES ON BEHALF OF THE DEFENSE. PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT NUMBER 1 HERETOFORE MARKED FOR IDENTIFICATION, ADMITTED INTO EVIDENCE. DEFENDANT'S EXHIBIT NUMBER A HERETOFORE MARKED FOR IDENTIFICATION, ADMITTED INTO EVIDENCE. CASE TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. RECEIVED CASE BACK FROM JUDGE WOODWARD. THE COURT'S RULING WITH REGARDS TO THE MATTER SUBMITTED ON 1/29/2008 IS ATTACHED HERETO AND MADE A PART HEREOF. COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO ALL PARTIES |
|
January 29, 2008 | Hearing |
4150 Small Claims Trial New Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.