Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Fca Usa Llc, Plaintiff, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Dolin Tionna Grace, Hugret Spencer Peter, Maclear Amy Patricia, Rogerson Hailey Marie, against Defendant, represented by Dolin Tionna Grace, Romano Mark Peter, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Ann I. Jones presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnn I. Jones Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 07, 2020 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Defendant (Respondent)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition for Coordination) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Plaintiff (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Defendant (Respondent)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Plaintiff (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Order Assigning Coordination Motion Judge; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Plaintiff (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Plaintiff (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Plaintiffs' Opposition to FCA US LLC's Petition for Coordination; Filed by: Defendant (Respondent)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00SLP Plaintiffs' Opposition to FCA US LLC's Petition for Coordination; Filed by: Defendant (Respondent)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Petitioner FCA USA, LLC's Petition for Coordination; Filed by: Plaintiff (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination; Filed by: Plaintiff (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00to Petition for Coordination and Request for Hearing; Filed by: Defendant (Respondent)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order; Filed by: FCA USA LLC (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: Defendant (Respondent)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Immediate Stay Requested; Filed by: Plaintiff (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Court's Ruling and Order Re: Defendant FCA's Petition for Coordination; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Opposition (to Petition for Coordination and Request for Hearing) Filed by Defendant (Respondent)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00SLP Plaintiffs' Opposition to FCA US LLC's Petition for Coordination Filed by Defendant (Respondent)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by FCA USA LLC (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Defendant (Respondent)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination Filed by FCA USA LLC (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Plaintiffs' Opposition to FCA US LLC's Petition for Coordination Filed by Defendant (Respondent)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Order Assigning Coordination Motion Judge Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Petition for Coordination (of FCA USA, LLC) Filed by FCA USA LLC (Petitioner) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition for Coordination)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Petition for Coordination) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Immediate Stay Requested Filed by FCA USA LLC (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by FCA USA LLC (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by FCA USA LLC (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Defendant (Respondent)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition for Coordination)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed by FCA USA LLC (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Court's Ruling and Order Re: Defendant FCA's Petition for Coordination Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by FCA USA LLC (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Tionna Grace Dolin (Attorney)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition for Coordination)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition for Coordination))
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Opposition (of Plaintiffs' to to Defendants Motion for Stay of Proceedings of the Included Cases)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Order Assigning Coordination Motion Judge
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Objection (of SLP Plaintiffs' to Defendant FCA US LLC's Petition for a Stay and Coordination)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Petition for Coordination (of FCA USA, LLC)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00SLP Plaintiffs' Opposition to FCA US LLC's Petition for Coordination
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Plaintiffs' Points and Authorities in Opposition to Petitioner FCA US, LLC's Petition for Coordination
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (in Support of Petition for Coordination)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Opposition (to Petition for Coordination and Request for Hearing)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Plaintiffs' Opposition to FCA US LLC's Petition for Coordination
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition for Coordination))
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/18/2020)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Immediate Stay Requested
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Petition for Coordination) of 11/09/2020)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Amy Maclear in Support of FCA's Petition
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (in Support of Petition for Coordination)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00SLP Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendant FCA US LLC's Petition for a Stay and Coordination
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion for Stay of Proceedings of the Included Cases
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Petitioner FCA USA, LLC's Petition for Coordination
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/17/2020)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.