Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Baker, Melissa, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Non-Traffic Infractions |
Last RefreshedMay 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
SARB Review Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
SARB Review Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
SARB Review Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
SARB Review Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
SARB Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.