Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Langley, Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 06, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Non-Traffic Infractions |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
SARB Review Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
SARB Review Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
SARB Review Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
SARB Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | New Case Complaint Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.