Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
People Of The State Of California, The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Ratty, William, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2018 |
CategoryAdult Non-Traffic Infractions |
Last RefreshedMarch 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
SARB Review Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissed by Court | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Fee(s) Reduced Pursuant to AB199 | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Shasta Collections | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Assessment Applied pursuant to PC1214.1(A) | |
January 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Fee(s) Reduced Pursuant to AB177 | |
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Assessment Notice Sent | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Check to Refer Case to Shasta | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.