Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Jensen, Sammantha, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 19, 2017 |
CategoryAdult Non-Traffic Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Case Cycle Time453 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
SARB Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
SARB Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
SARB Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
SARB Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
SARB Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.