Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Zavala, Annette, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 19, 2017 |
CategoryAdult Non-Traffic Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Case Cycle Time170 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Assessment Applied pursuant to PC1214.1(A) | |
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Assessment Notice Sent | |
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Delinquent Account | |
December 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
SARB Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
December 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
November 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
November 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
SARB Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
October 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
October 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
SARB Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
SARB Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.