Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Vandeventer, Lance Conrad, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Kim E. McBride Pera presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKim E. McBride Pera Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2014 |
CategoryAdult Non-Traffic Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Case Cycle Time232 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Shasta Collections | |
May 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
May 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Order/Stipulation for Judge Pro Tem | |
May 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Walk-In Criminal
Judge: McBride, Kim E |
|
May 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Walk-In | |
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Check to Refer Case to Shasta | |
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event | DMV FTA Update Processed | |
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event | DMV Communications | |
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Civil Assessment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.