Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Williams, Jennifer, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2013 |
CategoryAdult Non-Traffic Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Case Cycle Time20 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Shasta Collections | |
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Assessment Applied pursuant to PC1214.1(A) | |
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Assessment Notice Sent | |
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Walk-In Criminal
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Walk-In | |
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
December 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Traffic School Ineligible - All Charges are Correctable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.