Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Duncan, Debra Fay, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Michael A. Jacques presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael A. Jacques Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 06, 2011 |
CategoryAdult Non-Traffic Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Case Cycle Time25 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Walk-In Criminal
Judge: Jacques, Michael A |
|
July 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
July 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Letter Received | |
June 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Request for Walk-In | |
June 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
June 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Order/Stipulation for Judge Pro Tem | |
June 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Walk-In Criminal
Judge: Jacques, Michael A |
|
June 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Request for Walk-In | |
June 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Traffic School Ineligible - All Charges are Correctable | |
June 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.