Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Keyes, Kreg Robert, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Michael A. Jacques presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael A. Jacques Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 11, 2011 |
CategoryAdult Non-Traffic Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Case Cycle Time98 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Walk-In Criminal
Judge: Jacques, Michael A |
|
August 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
August 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice to Defendant Referral to RRO | |
August 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Request for Walk-In | |
August 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Letter Received | |
August 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Failure To Appear | |
August 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Civil Assessment | |
June 02, 2011 | Docket Event | 60 Day Extension Granted - Clerk | |
May 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.