Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Lecain, Michael Edward, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Michael A. Jacques presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael A. Jacques Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2010 |
CategoryAdult Non-Traffic Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Case Cycle Time112 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Shasta Collection - Odyssey | |
October 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
October 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
October 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Walk-In Criminal
Judge: Jacques, Michael A |
|
October 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Print Envelope (conversion) | |
October 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice to Defendant Referral to RRO | |
October 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Request for Walk-In | |
October 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Letter Received | |
October 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Civil Assessment | |
October 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Failure To Appear |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.