Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Galyardt, Douglas Nelson, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with James L. Curry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames L. Curry Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2006 |
CategoryAdult Non-Traffic Infractions |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions70 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
|
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Case Cycle Time72 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2007 | Docket Event | Check to Refer Case to Shasta | |
July 02, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice of Civil Assessment | |
March 05, 2007 | Docket Event | File in Transit | |
March 02, 2007 | Docket Event | Bail/Trust Forfeited | |
March 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Sentencing
Judge: Curry, James L |
|
March 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Pull w/Criminal
Judge: Curry, James L |
|
March 02, 2007 | Docket Event | Calendar/Commitment Form | |
March 02, 2007 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
February 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Pull w/Criminal
Judge: Curry, James L |
|
February 28, 2007 | Docket Event | Case pulled with Criminal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.