Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Whitehead, Melinda, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis J. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis J. Buckley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2005 |
CategoryAdult Non-Traffic Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Case Cycle Time222 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Shasta Collection - Odyssey | |
April 04, 2007 | Docket Event | Check to Refer Case to Shasta | |
January 29, 2007 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Violation of Court Order
Judge: Buckley, Dennis J |
|
January 04, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice of Civil Assessment | |
January 03, 2007 | Docket Event | Fail to Comply | |
July 24, 2006 | Docket Event | Calendar/Commitment Form | |
July 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Violation of Court Order
Judge: Buckley, Dennis J |
|
July 24, 2006 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
July 24, 2006 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.