Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Fuentes, Antonia, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2004 |
CategoryAdult Non-Traffic Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Case Cycle Time1287 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Shasta Collection - Odyssey | |
April 24, 2008 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
April 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Check to Refer Case to Shasta | |
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Warrant Cleared | |
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Failure To Appear | |
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Civil Assessment | |
March 16, 2005 | Docket Event | Warrant Issued | |
March 15, 2005 | Docket Event | Bench Warrant Issued | |
March 15, 2005 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
March 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Violation of Court Order
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.