Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Thomas, Jason, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis J. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis J. Buckley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2004 |
CategoryAdult Non-Traffic Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Case Cycle Time83 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2005 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
March 22, 2005 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
March 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Violation of Court Order
Judge: Buckley, Dennis J |
|
March 16, 2005 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
March 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
Walk-In Criminal
Judge: Buckley, Dennis J |
|
March 01, 2005 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 27, 2005 | Docket Event | Request for Walk-In | |
January 27, 2005 | Docket Event | O/R Filed | |
December 29, 2004 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.