Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Ridgway, Joseph Price, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis J. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis J. Buckley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2004 |
CategoryAdult Non-Traffic Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Case Cycle Time102 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Paid In Full | |
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Shasta Collection - Odyssey | |
August 17, 2007 | Docket Event | Check to Refer Case to Shasta | |
June 07, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice of Civil Assessment | |
March 29, 2005 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
March 29, 2005 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
March 29, 2005 | Docket Event | Financial Assessment Sheet | |
March 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Walk-In Criminal
Judge: Buckley, Dennis J |
|
March 29, 2005 | Docket Event | Transfer to A/R | |
March 02, 2005 | Docket Event | Request for Walk-In |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.