Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Denning, Sheril Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis J. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis J. Buckley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2003 |
CategoryAdult Non-Traffic Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Case Cycle Time1008 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Shasta Collection - Odyssey | |
September 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Arraignment
Judge: O'Connor, Kathleen R |
|
September 25, 2007 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 25, 2007 | Docket Event | Check to Refer Case to Shasta | |
September 04, 2007 | Docket Event | Arraignment on Complaint | |
September 04, 2007 | Docket Event | Calendar/Commitment Form | |
August 23, 2007 | Docket Event | Warrant Cleared | |
July 16, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice of Civil Assessment | |
July 16, 2007 | Docket Event | File Returned From Judge | |
July 09, 2007 | Docket Event | Bench Warrant Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.