Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Ryan, Quita Sue, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with David E. Wasilenko presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Wasilenko Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2002 |
CategoryAdult Non-Traffic Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Case Cycle Time1118 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2006 | Docket Event | DMV FTP Release Processed | |
April 07, 2005 | Docket Event | Failure To Pay | |
April 07, 2005 | Docket Event | DMV FTP Update Processed | |
January 12, 2005 | Docket Event | Financial Assessment Sheet | |
January 12, 2005 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
January 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Pull w/Criminal
Judge: Curry, James L |
|
January 12, 2005 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
November 30, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Pull w/Criminal
Judge: Evans, Timothy J |
|
November 30, 2004 | Docket Event | Case pulled with Criminal | |
November 04, 2004 | Docket Event | Case pulled with Criminal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.