Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Imt Associates, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Ruben Sundeen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRuben Sundeen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 18, 2006 |
CategoryConservatorship - Person & Estate |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Probate Examiner's Check List (REVISED) - Petition to Appoint Conservator, 7/7/06 Filed
Date: 2006-07-06T00:00:00Probate Examiner's Check List - Petition to Appoint Conservator, 7/7/06 Filed
Date: 2006-06-30T00:00:00Probate Examiner's Check List General PLan for 1-12-07 Filed
Date: 2007-01-09T00:00:00Probate Examiner's Check List General Plan for 11-17-06 Filed
Date: 2006-11-16T00:00:00Probate Examiner's Check List General Plan for 3-16-07 Filed
Date: 2007-03-13T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: General Plan for 5-18-07
Date: 2007-05-15T00:00:00Examiner's Notes re Amended first Account for 10-19-07
Date: 2007-10-12T00:00:00Examiner's Notes re Petition for Authority to Invest Funds per PC 16045 for 8/8/08
Date: 2008-07-29T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: Account ON 11/13/09
Date: 2009-11-09T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: Account ON 11/23/11
Date: 2011-11-21T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: Account on 12/23/11
Date: 2011-12-20T00:00:00Court Investigator Account Checksheet - Notes Checksheet for 5th Accounting
Date: 2015-11-19T00:00:00Court Investigator Account Checksheet - Notes 6th Accounting (3/1/18)
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Court Investigator's Notes: General Plan /Status Report reviewed by CI, no concerns okay to drop.
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Court Investigator Account Checksheet - Notes 7th Accounting (2/27/20)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Court Investigator's Notes: General Plan /Status Rprt reviewed by CI, clerk set NCD.
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Court Investigator's Notes: General Plan Status report reviewed - no concerns noted. OK to set NCD
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: Account 4th on 12/9/13
Date: 2013-12-06T00:00:00Examiner's Notes: Account (4th) on 2/13/14
Date: 2014-02-11T00:00:00Court Investigator Account Checksheet - Notes 6th Accounting (3/1/18)
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2022 |
Judge: Petition for Approval of Accounting |
||
January 07, 2022 |
Judge: Status Report |
||
October 04, 2021 |
Judge: Review |
||
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Dropped : comnpliance hearing on 10/4/21; 8th account filed on 9/30/21 | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Approval of Accounting Filed by IMT Associates | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Probate 01/20/2022 02:30 PM D- 201 | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Confidential Financial Information Re Eighth Account | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Probate 01/07/2022 03:30 PM D- 201 | |
January 21, 2021 |
Status Report
Judge: Ruben Sundeen |
||
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Conservatorship Hearing Commenced and Continued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.