Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Joonas Juhani Lehtineh, Lehtineh, Joonas Juhani, filed a(n) Unlimited Civil case against Tesla Motors, Inc.,, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 20, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Case Management Statement Filed by: Joonas Juhani Lehtineh (Plaintiff)
Date: December 10, 2021Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 01/11/2022 02:30 PM D- 22
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Joonas Juhani Lehtineh
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Declaration of Kimberli C Zazzi Filed
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2023 | Jury Trial | ||
June 29, 2023 | Pre-Trial Conference | ||
June 05, 2023 | Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) | ||
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Emailed Notice of Mediator Selection reminder email to Tesla Motors, Inc., (brtanner@tesla.com) ADR |
|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Emailed Notice of Mediator Selection reminder email to Joonas Juhani Lehtineh (legal@lemonlawpro.com) ADR |
|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Updated -- Joonas Juhani Lehtineh (Plaintiff):Name Suffix: blank Party |
|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
03/30/2022 Private Mediation status changed to Selection Filed ADR |
|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
05/04/2022 Notice of Mediator Selection Form received. ADR |
|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Mediator Selection Form Issued by: Clerk Document |
|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
03/30/2022 Private Mediation added ADR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.