Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
De Santos, Elia, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Fabliny , Michael, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Joscelyn C. Jones presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoscelyn C. Jones Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2020 |
CategoryCh-100 Request For Orders To Stop Harassment (Civil Harassment) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Returned Mail: Order on Request to Continue Hearing Filed | |
August 18, 2020 |
Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment
Judge: Joscelyn Jones |
||
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Harassment Commenced and Completed | |
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Restraining Order After Hearing Granted | |
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Not Found or Non Service Return Filed | |
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address Filed | |
July 28, 2020 |
Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment
Judge: Pelayo A. Llamas |
||
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of New Hearing Date and Order on Reissuance (Civil Harassment) (CLETS) Filed | |
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Harassment 08/18/2020 08:30 AM D- 519 | |
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Harassment Commenced and Completed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.