Search anything: judges, parties, opposing counsel, motion types, legal issues

We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Singh VS Chahal

Case Last Refreshed: 3 months, 3 weeks

Case Overview

On September 26, 2016 A Civil case was filed by Singh, Kamaljeet, against Chahal, Satnam Singh, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County.

Case Details

Case Number

(Subscribe to View)

Filing Date

September 26, 2016

Last Refreshed

Feb 24, 2021

Filing Location

Alameda County, CA

Category

CH-100 Request for Orders to Stop Harassment (Civil Harassment)

Practice Area

Torts

Matter Type

Harassment

Case Cycle Time

45 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Case Documents

Case History

Type Title - Description Documents
Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment

judge: James P. Cramer

Docket Event Civil Harassment Commenced and Completed
Docket Event Not Found or Non Service Return Filed
Docket Event Hearing Reset to Civil Harassment 11/10/2016 01:35 PM D- 514
Docket Event Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment Dismissed
Docket Event Hearing Reset to Civil Harassment 11/08/2016 01:30 PM D- 511
Docket Event Hearing Reset to Civil Harassment 11/10/2016 01:35 PM D- 507
Docket Event Order Setting Aside Entire Dismissal Filed
Docket Event Hearing Reset to Civil Harassment 10/24/2016 01:35 PM D- 511
Docket Event Civil Harassment Hearing Dropped from dept: 511 date: 10/24/2016 time: 01:35 PM
Showing See all events

Document Requested

Your request has been received. We will email you this document within 4 business hours.

You have used out of 0 document requests left today

Continue

Document Requested

You have exceeded your document request limit for today.

If you need immediate assistance, please contact [email protected]

Continue

Docket Refresh Requested

Your docket refresh request has been received. You will receive a notification when the docket is refreshed.

Continue

Docket Refresh Requested

A refresh is already in progress.

If you need immediate assistance, please contact [email protected]

Continue

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.

Please wait a moment while we load this page.