Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Midland Financial Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Perez, Cintia, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Evelio M. Grillo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEvelio M. Grillo Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2014 |
CategoryCollections |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions479 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1965 days |
Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) As To Cintia Perez Filed
Date: March 17, 2015Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: June 15, 2015Judgment Entered
Date: June 15, 2015Judgment Default : Court per CCP 585 Declaration Filed
Date: June 15, 2015Not Found or Non Service Return Filed
Date: 2014-03-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Midland Financial LLC
Date: 2014-02-21T00:00:00Declaration of Venue Filed
Date: 2014-02-21T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Cintia Perez Filed
Date: 2014-05-30T00:00:00Limited Collections Order
Date: April 06, 2015Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2014-02-21T00:00:00Complaint - Collections Filed
Date: 2014-02-21T00:00:00Compliance Hearing 04/06/2015 09:01 AM D- 14
Date: 2015-02-18T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: April 06, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.