Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gonsalves, Matthew J., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Magpayo, Fulvio M., in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Brenda Harbin-Forte presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrenda Harbin-Forte Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management136 days |
Filing DateOctober 18, 2013 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time427 days |
Initial Case Management Conference 03/03/2014 02:30 PM D- 516
Date: October 21, 2013Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: December 19, 2014Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for MATTHEW J. GONSALVES
Date: October 18, 2013Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2013-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: October 21, 2013Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: March 03, 2014Case Management Statement of MATTHEW J. GONSALVES Filed
Date: December 31, 2013Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: March 03, 2014Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed
Date: 2013-10-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.