Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Gentile, Danielle, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Evelio M. Grillo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEvelio M. Grillo Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 25, 2013 |
CategoryCollections - Reduced Fee (B&P 6322.1) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions459 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2331 days |
Declaration Filed
Date: 2013-04-25T00:00:00Memo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for Midland Funding LLC
Date: September 14, 2018Proof of Service on Complaint As to Danielle Gentile Filed
Date: 2013-05-10T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to B&P 6322.1 Filed
Date: 2013-04-25T00:00:00Writ of Execution - Partially Satisfied from Sacramento Filed
Date: September 12, 2019Judgment Entered
Date: August 15, 2014Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2014-06-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Midland Funding LLC
Date: 2013-04-25T00:00:00Collections - Reduced Fee (B&P 6322.1) Filed
Date: 2013-04-25T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2013-04-25T00:00:00Compliance Hearing 06/09/2014 09:01 AM D- 31
Date: 2014-04-21T00:00:00Limited Collections Order
Date: 2014-06-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.