Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
L.A. Commercial Group, Inc., A Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against L.S. Trucking Inc., A Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Evelio M. Grillo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEvelio M. Grillo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management136 days |
Filing DateApril 27, 2012 |
CategoryCollections |
Time To Trial312 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time608 days |
Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2013-03-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for L.A. Commercial Group, Inc., a corporation
Date: 2012-04-27T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-03-05T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to L.S. Trucking Inc., a corporation Filed
Date: 2012-05-22T00:00:00Complaint - Collections Filed
Date: 2012-04-27T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: November 04, 2013Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2012-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed for L.A. Commercial Group, Inc., a corporation
Date: November 15, 2013Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2012-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2013-03-25T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2012-04-27T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2012-09-10T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 11/14/2013 09:00 AM D- 18
Date: 2013-08-28T00:00:00Settlement Conference Statement of L.S. Trucking Inc., a corporation Filed
Date: 2013-10-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement of L.S. Trucking Inc., a corporation Filed
Date: 2012-08-28T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2013-08-23T00:00:00Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 10/15/2013 09:30 AM D- 31
Date: 2013-03-18T00:00:00Compliance Hearing 01/17/2014 09:00 AM D- 18
Date: November 18, 2013Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2013-10-15T00:00:00General Denial To Complaint Filed for L.S. Trucking Inc., a corporation
Date: 2012-07-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement of L.S. Trucking Inc., a corporation Filed
Date: 2013-02-15T00:00:00Settlement Conference Statement of L.A. Commercial Group, Inc., a corporation Filed
Date: 2013-10-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement of L.A. Commercial Group, Inc., a corporation Filed
Date: 2013-02-01T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: October 29, 2013Case Management Statement of L.A. Commercial Group, Inc., a corporation Filed
Date: 2012-08-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for L.A. Commercial Group, Inc., a corporation
Date: December 16, 2013Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: 2013-10-01T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: December 26, 2013Case Management Statement of L.S. Trucking Inc., a corporation Filed
Date: October 30, 2013Initial Case Management Conference 09/10/2012 03:30 PM D- 18
Date: 2012-07-09T00:00:00Miscellaneous Sign in Sheet for Settlement Conference Filed
Date: 2013-10-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.