Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Luevano-Reyes, Joel, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Recontrust Company, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Bank Of New York Mellon, Bank Of America, N.A., in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with George C. Hernandez, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGeorge C. Hernandez, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management138 days |
Filing DateNovember 02, 2011 |
CategoryOther Real Property |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions153 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Case Cycle Time232 days |
Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2012-03-19T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 03/19/2012 02:30 PM D- 514
Date: 2011-11-03T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Recontrust Company, N.A. Filed
Date: 2011-11-28T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Bank of America, N.A. Filed
Date: 2011-11-28T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Bank of New York Mellon Filed
Date: 2011-11-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Joel Luevano-Reyes
Date: 2011-11-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Bank of New York Mellon, Bank of America, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Reg
Date: 2012-03-02T00:00:00Motion to Postpone a Non Judicial Foreclosure Filed by Joel Luevano-Reyes
Date: 2012-04-05T00:00:00Demurrer to Complaint Filed by Bank of New York Mellon, Bank of America, N.A., Mortgage Electronic R
Date: 2011-12-21T00:00:00Complaint Other Real Property Filed
Date: 2011-11-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Joel Luevano-Reyes Filed
Date: 2012-02-24T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2011-11-02T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. Filed
Date: 2011-11-28T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2011-11-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Joel Luevano-Reyes Filed
Date: 2012-05-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Notice of Plaintiff's intent to file a first amended complaint Filed
Date: 2012-03-23T00:00:00Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint Filed by Bank of New York Mellon, Bank of America, N.A., Rec
Date: 2012-04-04T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2012-03-19T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2012-03-29T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2012-05-31T00:00:00Motion to Postpone a Non Judicial Foreclosure Denied
Date: 2012-05-31T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: June 04, 2012Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Postpone Filed
Date: 2012-05-18T00:00:00Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint - Dropped
Date: June 21, 2012Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: June 21, 2012Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered
Date: June 14, 2012Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: June 04, 2012Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: June 13, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.