Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lhr Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Calonje, Ronald, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Boydine A. Hall presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBoydine A. Hall Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 10, 2006 |
CategoryCollections |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions140 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3089 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for LHR Inc.
Date: 2006-07-10T00:00:00Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) As To Ronald Calonje Filed
Date: 2006-11-27T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Ronald Calonje Filed
Date: 2006-08-24T00:00:00Initial Collection Case Review 12/01/2006 09:00 AM D- 520
Date: 2006-10-11T00:00:00Complaint - Collections Filed
Date: 2006-07-10T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money)
Date: 2006-11-14T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2006-07-10T00:00:00Memo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for LHR Inc.
Date: 2008-09-22T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Writ of Execution
Date: January 15, 2013Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: 2013-01-11T00:00:00Writ of Execution - Partially Satisfied from Alameda Filed
Date: 2008-06-19T00:00:00OEX - Dropped - Neither Side Appearing
Date: December 05, 2014Writ of Execution - Unsatisfied from Alameda Filed
Date: 2009-11-03T00:00:00Memo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for LHR Inc.
Date: January 22, 2013Default Judgment (Money) Entered
Date: 2006-11-27T00:00:00Writ of Execution - Partially Satisfied from Alameda Filed
Date: 2009-05-29T00:00:00Memo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for LHR Inc.
Date: 2009-04-02T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Writ of Execution
Date: 2007-11-21T00:00:00Letter re Response to Writ of Execution and garnishment. Received
Date: March 29, 2013Writ of Execution - Unsatisfied from Alameda Filed
Date: December 24, 2014Civil Order of Examination Issued
Date: September 30, 2014Declaration Of Steven A. Booska RE: Post Judgment Accrued Interest Filed
Date: January 22, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.