Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Alameda, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Mengistu , Judas Sidawit, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Boydine A. Hall presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBoydine A. Hall Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2019 |
CategoryParental Relationship/Obligations |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions312 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2020 |
Notice of Motion re
Judge: Boydine Hall |
||
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Commenced and Completed | |
December 15, 2020 |
Judge: Notice of Motion re |
||
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment Regarding Parental Obligations Filed | |
August 24, 2020 |
Notice of Motion re
Judge: Boydine Hall |
||
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to RFO - Family Law dept: 508 date: 12/15/2020 time: 08:35 AM | |
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Commenced and Continued | |
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration Filed for Respondent | |
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law 08/24/2020 08:30 AM D- 508 | |
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion re Child Support,.. Filed by Petitioner - judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.