Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Carter, Cassandra Lynn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Neto, Ubiraci Vieira, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Jenna M. Whitman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJenna M. Whitman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2018 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2021 |
Judge: Family Law Status Conference |
||
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference 10/07/2021 02:00 PM D- 507 | |
June 03, 2021 |
Family Law Status Conference
Judge: Jenna Whitman |
||
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Law Status Conference Commenced and Completed | |
June 03, 2021 |
Judge: Family Law Status Conference |
||
June 02, 2021 |
Judge: Family Law Status Conference |
||
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Not Entered, Reject Letter Iss'd | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Family Law Status Conference 06/03/2021 01:00 PM D- 507 | |
February 08, 2021 |
Judge: Family Law Status Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.