Search anything: judges, parties, opposing counsel, motion types, legal issues

We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Rios VS Rios

Case Last Refreshed: 5 months, 1 week

Case Overview

On March 17, 2017 A Civil case was filed by Rios, Sandra, against Rios - Cdcr# Bb5902, Israel, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County.

Case Details

Case Number

(Subscribe to View)

Filing Date

March 17, 2017

Last Refreshed

Feb 23, 2021

Filing Location

Alameda County, CA

Category

Dissolution of Marriage

Practice Area

Family

Matter Type

Divorce,Separation

Verdict

Unclassified

Case History

Type Title - Description Documents
Docket Event Order Of Reassignment of Judge Filed
Docket Event Family Law Status Conference Commenced and Completed
Family Law Status Conference

judge: Jennifer Madden

Docket Event Hearing Reset to Family Law Status Conference 08/21/2020 08:30 AM D- 522
Docket Event Hearing Reset to Family Law Status Conference 07/09/2020 09:05 AM D- 522
Docket Event Hearing Continued to Family Law Status Conference dept: 522 date: 05/01/2020 time: 09:05 AM
Docket Event Family Law Status Conference Commenced and Continued
Family Law Status Conference

judge: Cherie Davis

Docket Event Case Resolution Conference Questionnaire of Israel Rios - CDCR# BB5902 Filed
Docket Event Letter from Respondent Filed
Showing See all events

Document Requested

Your request has been received. We will email you this document within 4 business hours.

You have used out of 0 document requests left today

Continue

Document Requested

You have exceeded your document request limit for today.

If you need immediate assistance, please contact [email protected]

Continue

Docket Refresh Requested

Your docket refresh request has been received. You will receive a notification when the docket is refreshed.

Continue

Docket Refresh Requested

A refresh is already in progress.

If you need immediate assistance, please contact [email protected]

Continue

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.

Please wait a moment while we load this page.