Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Alameda, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Ontiveros, Euriah David, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 09, 2016 |
CategoryParental Relationship/Obligations |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions79 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
|
Case Cycle Time1310 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Euriah David Ontiveros Entered | |
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Euriah David Ontiveros Filed | |
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment Regarding Parental Obligations Filed | |
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Substituted Service Filed | |
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons and Supplemental Complaint Regarding Parental Obligations Filed | |
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice Regarding Payment of Support Filed | |
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail as to Euriah David Ontiveros Filed | |
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail as to Mina Lee Filed | |
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice Regarding Payment of Support Filed | |
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Euriah David Ontiveros Entered |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.