Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Alameda, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Carbajal, Jose Manoa Jr, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 11, 2013 |
CategoryParental Relationship/Obligations |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions145 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
|
Case Cycle Time1481 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Registration of California Support Order Filed | |
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Letter from Florida Department of Revenue Child Support Program Filed | |
October 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice Regarding Payment of Support Filed | |
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Jose Manoa Carbajal JR Entered | |
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Jose Manoa Carbajal JR Filed | |
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment Regarding Parental Obligations Filed | |
September 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on Summons and Complaint Regarding Parental Obligations As to Jose Manoa Carbajal J | |
July 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint Regarding Parental Obligations Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.