Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lembesis , Nikolas K., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lembesis, Kathy, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2012 |
CategoryLegal Separation Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time439 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Order Voiding Filings of Kathy Lembesis entered | |
March 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Request Re: Waive Court Fees As to Kathy Lembesis Denied | |
March 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service on Petition for Legal Separation As to Kathy Lembesis Filed | |
March 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Request Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Kathy Lembesis | |
March 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Response to Petition for Legal Separation Filed for Kathy Lembesis | |
March 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act Filed | |
March 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail FL-120 Filed | |
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act Filed | |
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons on Petition Issued and Filed | |
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Petition for Legal Separation Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.