Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Flores, Paulo C, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Flores, Lilian, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 15, 2010 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions188 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time188 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed | |
April 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Judgment of Dissolution Filed | |
April 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration Re: Default or Uncontested Judgment Filed for Paulo C Flores | |
April 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Proposed Judgment Received | |
April 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Proposed Judgment Received | |
March 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Rejection Letter Issued on Judgment of Dissolution | |
February 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration of Petitioner RE: Declaration of Parentage Filed | |
February 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration of Respondent RE: Declaration of Parentage Filed | |
December 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Lilian Flores Filed | |
December 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.