Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bower, Anna, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Bower, John, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Thomas J. Nixon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas J. Nixon Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2010 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1010 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time1010 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Judgment of Dissolution Filed | |
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed | |
November 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney Filed for Anna Bower | |
November 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Proposed Judgment Received | |
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Rejection Letter Issued on Judgment of Dissolution | |
August 27, 2012 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law Hearing Dropped from dept: 504 date: 08/29/2012 time: 09:00 AM | |
August 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Letter re dropping 8/29/12 hearing date Filed | |
August 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure Filed | |
August 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure Filed | |
August 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Proposed Judgment Received |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.