Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Alameda, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Graham,, Leo F. Iii, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Sue Alexander presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSue Alexander Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 01, 2006 |
CategoryParental Relationship/Obligations |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions98 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
|
Case Cycle Time2082 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing Re: Notice of Motion for Modification Filed | |
January 10, 2012 |
Notice of Motion for Modification
Judge: Sue Alexander |
||
January 10, 2012 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law Commenced and Completed | |
November 30, 2011 | Docket Event | OSC - Family Law 01/10/2012 09:00 AM D- 508 | |
November 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion for Modification Child Support,.. Filed by Petitioner | |
August 07, 2006 | Docket Event | Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Leo F. Graham, III Filed | |
August 07, 2006 | Docket Event | Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Leo F. Graham, III Entered | |
August 07, 2006 | Docket Event | Judgment Regarding Parental Obligations Filed | |
July 05, 2006 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service on Summons and Complaint Regarding Parental Obligations As to Leo F. Graha | |
May 01, 2006 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint Regarding Parental Obligations Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.