Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jiang, Jeny Yumei, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Young, Warren, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 14, 2005 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions465 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time465 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2007 | Docket Event | Declaration Re: Default or Uncontested Judgment Filed for Warren Young | |
February 22, 2007 | Docket Event | Judgment of Dissolution Filed | |
February 22, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed | |
November 17, 2006 | Docket Event | Appearance, Stipulations, and Waivers Filed | |
November 17, 2006 | Docket Event | Stipulation and waiver of final declaration of disclosure Filed | |
May 23, 2006 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration Filed for Respondent | |
May 23, 2006 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure Filed | |
March 02, 2006 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney Filed for Jeny Yumei Jiang | |
January 12, 2006 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Attachments to Declaration of Disclosure Filed | |
January 12, 2006 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.